Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 2 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 4474 Week
» 23375 Month
» 23375 Year
» 1688751 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 508 m/e 03/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5508 m/e 04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2662 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 62662 m/e 05/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
03/1920 PRINCE OF WALES

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 03/1920
Withdrawal Mon 08/08/1960
Scrapping During 08/1960
Service Life 40 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1920
IMM Immingham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 04/11/1950
9G Northwich 4w/e 08/10/1955
41A Sheffield Darnall 5w/e 14/06/1958
   Withdrawn on 08/08/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 21/10/1950
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) on 22/10/1950
LOAN 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 28/10/1950
ALLOC 9C Macclesfield 4w/e 08/10/1955
LOAN 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 19/05/1956
EXLOAN 9G Northwich 4w/e 19/05/1956
LOAN 41A Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 14/06/1958
WDN   on 08/08/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1949 Long Travel Valves fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/08/1958 DarnallMPD Dll 62662 Prince of Wales is ex-works fully lined out and kept smart in contrast to the other D1 ls (62660/1/4-70) at this shed. All the D11s in the south are now on the GC section; in addition to Sheffield -Nottingham locals (a Staveley one even works to Leicester) they also work locals to Lincoln. SLS/195809

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1920 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 508, name: PRINCE OF WALES
Built at Gorton Works
   
04/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5508    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2662    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
05/1949 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62662    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (9G)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
08/08/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 62662    

prev prev