Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 277 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5888 Week
» 16934 Month
» 16934 Year
» 1682310 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 501 m/e 09/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5501 m/e 11/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2665 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 62665 m/e 06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/1922 MONS

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 09/1922
Withdrawal Fri 08/05/1959
Scrapping During 07/1959
Service Life 36 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1922
IMM Immingham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9G Northwich 4w/e 04/12/1954
41A Sheffield Darnall 5w/e 14/06/1958
   Withdrawn on 08/05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC COL Colchester on 28/12/1946
ALLOC IMM Immingham on 14/07/1947
LOAN 13A Trafford Park (LMS) on 26/03/1950
ALLOC 9G Northwich 4w/e 25/12/1954
LOAN 41A Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 14/06/1958
WDN   on 08/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1952 Long Travel Valves fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/08/1958 DarnallMPD Dll 62662 Prince of Wales is ex-works fully lined out and kept smart in contrast to the other D1 ls (62660/1/4-70) at this shed. All the D11s in the south are now on the GC section; in addition to Sheffield -Nottingham locals (a Staveley one even works to Leicester) they also work locals to Lincoln. SLS/195809
02/05/1959 Staveley MPD (41H) ex GCR 62665 has gone from store to Gorton Works for overhaul; 62663 is back at work on the GC line (Sheffield-Nottingham-Leicester). D11s still stored on 2nd May are 62660/1/6/9. Three diesel shunters from 41A shunt in the yards here. SLS/195907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1922 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 501, name: MONS
Built at Gorton Works
   
11/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5501    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2665    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62665    
02/1952 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (9G)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
08/05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 62665    

prev prev