Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 41 Today
» 1160 Yesterday
» 3366 Week
» 3366 Month
» 70228 Year
» 1735604 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 502 m/e 10/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5502 m/e 11/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2666 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 62666 m/e 09/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1922 ZEEBRUGGE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 10/1922
Withdrawal Mon 05/12/1960
Service Life 38 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1922
IMM   Immingham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) on 22/10/1950
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 04/11/1950
40B   Immingham 4w/e 14/02/1953
36B   Mexborough 4w/e 25/07/1953
40A   Lincoln 4w/e 24/10/1953
41A   Sheffield Darnall 5w/e 20/04/1957
     Withdrawn on 05/12/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IMM Immingham on 10/08/1947
LOAN 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 21/10/1950
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) on 22/10/1950
LOAN 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 28/10/1950
EXLOAN 40B Immingham 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 41A Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 20/04/1957
WDN   on 05/12/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1947 Long Travel Valves fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/08/1957 Darnall MPD The electric shed was closed as from 17th August and is to be converted to a diesel depot. Dll's in store at present are 62660/3/6/7/70. SLS/195711
09/08/1958 DarnallMPD Dll 62662 Prince of Wales is ex-works fully lined out and kept smart in contrast to the other D1 ls (62660/1/4-70) at this shed. All the D11s in the south are now on the GC section; in addition to Sheffield -Nottingham locals (a Staveley one even works to Leicester) they also work locals to Lincoln. SLS/195809
02/05/1959 Staveley MPD (41H) ex GCR 62665 has gone from store to Gorton Works for overhaul; 62663 is back at work on the GC line (Sheffield-Nottingham-Leicester). D11s still stored on 2nd May are 62660/1/6/9. Three diesel shunters from 41A shunt in the yards here. SLS/195907
19/12/1960 Doncaster Works (Scrap Road) New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1922 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 502, name: ZEEBRUGGE
Built at Gorton Works
   
11/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5502    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2666    
08/1947 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62666    
22/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
25/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
08/06/1957 Report Report: Two "Jubilees," Nos. 45621 (67A) and 45654 (19B), were also recorded (on Bridlington’s Whitsun traffic) during the weekend, and our correspondent also heard but could not confirm that Darnall "D11" 4-4-0 No. 62666 appeared on an excursion from Sheffield. (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957)    
25/06/1957 Report Report: We noted the “D11" (62666) at York again on June 25. (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957)    
12/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    
05/12/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 62666    

prev prev