Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 82 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 82 Week
» 26703 Month
» 26703 Year
» 1692079 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 503 m/e 11/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5503 m/e 12/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2667 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 62667 m/e 10/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/1922 SOMME

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 11/1922
Withdrawal Fri 12/08/1960
Scrapping During 09/1960
Service Life 37 yrs, 9 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1922
IMM Immingham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 27/01/1951
40B Immingham 4w/e 14/02/1953
40F Boston 5w/e 21/03/1953
36B Mexborough 4w/e 25/07/1953
40A Lincoln 4w/e 24/10/1953
41A Sheffield Darnall 5w/e 20/04/1957
   Withdrawn on 12/08/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IMM Immingham on 14/07/1947
LOAN 9E Trafford Park (LMS) m/e 31/01/1951
EXLOAN 40B Immingham 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 40F Boston 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 41A Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 20/04/1957
TOSTORE   4w/e 27/12/1958
WDN   on 12/08/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1945 Long Travel Valves fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1945 Belle Vue MPD 2700, 2971, 5180/7,5429/30, 5503, 6100, 6031 an 6575 were noted on trials ex Gorton during November. 4665 was noted on a local passenger ex Manchester (London Road). other strangers included 1992 ex G.W. SLS/194601
17/08/1957 Darnall MPD The electric shed was closed as from 17th August and is to be converted to a diesel depot. Dll's in store at present are 62660/3/6/7/70. SLS/195711
09/08/1958 DarnallMPD Dll 62662 Prince of Wales is ex-works fully lined out and kept smart in contrast to the other D1 ls (62660/1/4-70) at this shed. All the D11s in the south are now on the GC section; in addition to Sheffield -Nottingham locals (a Staveley one even works to Leicester) they also work locals to Lincoln. SLS/195809

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1922 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 503, name: SOMME
Built at Gorton Works
   
12/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5503    
10/1945 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2667    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62667    
27/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (40F)    
25/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
10/06/1957 Report Report: "D11" 4-4-0 No. 62667 (41A) was seen at Boston on June 10. (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957)    
12/08/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 62667    

prev prev