Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 39 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 39 Week
» 7651 Month
» 74513 Year
» 1739889 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 504 m/e 11/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5504 m/e 12/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2668 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 62668 m/e 05/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/1922 JUTLAND

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 11/1922
Withdrawal Thu 17/11/1960
Service Life 38 yrs , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1922
IMM   Immingham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) m/e 30/11/1950
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 02/12/1950
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) m/e 31/12/1950
41A   Sheffield Darnall 5w/e 14/06/1958
     Withdrawn on 17/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IMM Immingham on 14/07/1947
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) m/e 31/12/1950
LOAN 41A Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 14/06/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 27/12/1958
WDN   on 17/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1946 Long Travel Valves fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/08/1958 DarnallMPD Dll 62662 Prince of Wales is ex-works fully lined out and kept smart in contrast to the other D1 ls (62660/1/4-70) at this shed. All the D11s in the south are now on the GC section; in addition to Sheffield -Nottingham locals (a Staveley one even works to Leicester) they also work locals to Lincoln. SLS/195809

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1922 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 504, name: JUTLAND
Built at Gorton Works
   
12/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5504    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2668    
11/1946 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62668    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
17/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 62668    
12/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev