Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 1005 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6616 Week
» 17662 Month
» 17662 Year
» 1683038 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 505 m/e 12/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5505 m/e 11/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2669 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 62669 m/e 02/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/1922 YPRES

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 12/1922
Withdrawal Fri 12/08/1960
Scrapping During 08/1960
Service Life 37 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1922
IMM Immingham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 02/12/1950
9G Northwich 8w/e 14/06/1952
41A Sheffield Darnall 5w/e 14/06/1958
   Withdrawn on 12/08/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IMM Immingham on 14/07/1947
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 9G Northwich 4w/e 14/06/1952
LOAN 41A Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 14/06/1958
WDN   on 12/08/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1937 Long Travel Valves fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/09/1953 Northwich MPD The following Class J.10 0-6-0's were on the shed at 10 p.m., 65134, 65139, 65165, 65156, 65158, 65169 an 65202. Class D.10 4-4-0, 62659 Worsley Taylor, was at the end of No. 3 road, inside the shed minus her tender, with D.11, 62669 Ypres, on the adjoining road. Only one 'Super-D' (49435) was present. The balance of the inhabitants was made up of '8F's', a few Class 4 0-6-0's, a '3F' 0-6-0 and one N.5 0-6-2T, Number 69255. No O.4's were in evidence. Ex.G.C. 2-6-4 tank 69052 has returned to Northwich shed as from 20/9, having had a reprieve from scrapping. From 21/9, the whole of the working of limestone traffic between Tunstead and Northwich has been entrusted to Northwich shed, instead of being shared with Heaton Mersey. This will result in the saving of seven sets of men and nearly 1,500 miles of 'light engine' running annually. Three additional 8F's have been allocated to 9E for the new rosters. SLS/195311
24/04/1954 Northwich MPD No major changes were noted at this depot on 24th April. No 69052 has recently been to Gorton for overhaul, and has evidently developed some further defect, since she was suspended from the bunker end under the sheerlegs. It was interesting to discern quite distinctly under the coat of paint on the tender sides of 48046, the letters 'W.D.' with the broad arrow between. Two engines of class D10 were on the shed, 62659 'Worsley Taylor' and 62653 'Sir Edward Fraser,' while 62656 'Sir Clement Royds' was working the 3.40 p.m. Manchester-Chester train. Dll 62669 'Ypres' was still under repair at the back of the shed. SLS/195405
09/08/1958 DarnallMPD Dll 62662 Prince of Wales is ex-works fully lined out and kept smart in contrast to the other D1 ls (62660/1/4-70) at this shed. All the D11s in the south are now on the GC section; in addition to Sheffield -Nottingham locals (a Staveley one even works to Leicester) they also work locals to Lincoln. SLS/195809
02/05/1959 Staveley MPD (41H) ex GCR 62665 has gone from store to Gorton Works for overhaul; 62663 is back at work on the GC line (Sheffield-Nottingham-Leicester). D11s still stored on 2nd May are 62660/1/6/9. Three diesel shunters from 41A shunt in the yards here. SLS/195907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1922 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 505, name: YPRES
Built at Gorton Works
   
11/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5505    
01/1937 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2669    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62669    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (9G)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
12/08/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 62669    

prev prev