Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 290 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 3643 Week
» 30264 Month
» 30264 Year
» 1695640 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 511 m/e 12/1922
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5511 m/e 02/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2670 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 62670 m/e 04/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/1922 MARNE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 12/1922
Withdrawal Tue 15/11/1960
Scrapping During 01/1961
Service Life 37 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1922
IMM Immingham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
40B Immingham 4w/e 21/11/1953
40A Lincoln 4w/e 25/05/1956
41A Sheffield Darnall 5w/e 20/04/1957
   Withdrawn on 15/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 13F Walton on the Hill on 31/03/1950
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 31/10/1953
LOAN 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 26/05/1956
ALLOC 41A Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 20/04/1957
TOSTORE   4w/e 27/12/1958
WDN   on 15/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1945 Long Travel Valves fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/08/1957 Darnall MPD The electric shed was closed as from 17th August and is to be converted to a diesel depot. Dll's in store at present are 62660/3/6/7/70. SLS/195711
09/08/1958 DarnallMPD Dll 62662 Prince of Wales is ex-works fully lined out and kept smart in contrast to the other D1 ls (62660/1/4-70) at this shed. All the D11s in the south are now on the GC section; in addition to Sheffield -Nottingham locals (a Staveley one even works to Leicester) they also work locals to Lincoln. SLS/195809

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1922 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 511, name: MARNE
Built at Gorton Works
   
02/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5511    
05/1945 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2670    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62670    
21/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
25/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
15/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 62670    

prev prev