Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 229 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2498 Week
» 21399 Month
» 21399 Year
» 1686775 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6387 m/e 10/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2680 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 62680 m/e 02/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1924 LUCY ASHTON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 5388
To Service During 10/1924
Withdrawal Fri 08/09/1961
Scrapping During 09/1961
Service Life 36 yrs, 11 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1924
EFD Eastfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 08/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   on 08/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1940 Long Travel Valves fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/02/1948 Cowlairs Works No engines have as yet (7/2) appeared from Cowlairs Works lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' or painted in any new style; the same remarks also apply to Q.P. Works. Further locomotives ex Cowlairs Works painted green are: Nos. 1787-89, 2679/80, while Nos. 2440/2, 9189, an 9215 were just ex Works, the latter having acquired the vacuum brake SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1924 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 6387, name: LUCY ASHTON
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5388
   
06/1940 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2680    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62680    
08/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 62680    

prev prev