Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 998 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 998 Week
» 19899 Month
» 19899 Year
» 1685275 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6389 m/e 10/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2682 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 62682 m/e 06/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1924 HATSTOUN OF BUCKLAW

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 5390
To Service During 10/1924
Withdrawal Sat 29/07/1961
Scrapping During 09/1961
Service Life 36 yrs, 9 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1924
EFD Eastfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 29/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   on 29/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1940 Long Travel Valves fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/03/1961 Polmont MPD (in store) On 11th Mch. the following were in store-62682/9/90/1/3, 64482/515/8/32/5, 68448/54/71/2, 69014. SLS/196104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1924 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 6389, name: HATSTOUN OF BUCKLAW
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5390
   
07/1940 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2682    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62682    
29/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 62682    

prev prev