Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 360 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 3713 Week
» 30334 Month
» 30334 Year
» 1695710 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6390 m/e 10/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2683 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 62683 m/e 05/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1924 HOBBIE ELLIOTT

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Works Number 605
To Service During 10/1924
Withdrawal Wed 17/09/1958
Scrapping During 03/1959
Service Life 33 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1924
HAY Haymarket on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 17/09/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe on 11/01/1947
WDN   on 17/09/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 21/03/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1946 Long Travel Valves fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/04/1946 Midland Section 4825 has been fitted with a self-cleaning smoke-box (15/4). 2683 (26A) was noted at Wellingborough, running light, on 20/3. An interesting working for which Bedford shed is responsible is a trip to Gloucester. The route is via Northampton and Stratford, and the locomotive, usually a 3F, is due out at 3 a.m, and does not re-turn until late at night. SLS/194605
24/11/1945 Willesden No. 28786, one of the last survivors of the L.N.W. 19in. goods worked a goods train from Willesden on 24/11/45. This is the first known appearance of one of these engines in London for many years. SLS/194605
27/08/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60502/05, 61081, 61727, 1729, 61736/46, 1753, 61759/83/91, 1823, 61876/78, 61988/93, 2428, 62683, 2687, 62688, 3180, 4546/47/64/79, 4703, 64855, 4945/86, 65913, 67478, 68113, 8321, 8477, 68481, 8544, 68955, 69183, 69213, 77306, ex L.M.S. 40170, 44795, 45022, 45451, 54654. During W/E 20/8 Cowlairs started putting the crest on both passenger and goods tender engines which had received a general repair (not intermediate repair) and the following have been noted: Nos. 61308, 61766, 64700 an 90313; no tank engines have so far been noted with the crest-No. 68477 appeared in lined black, with British Railways on the tanks. SLS/194910

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1924 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 6390, name: HOBBIE ELLIOTT
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 605
   
05/1946 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2683    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Haymarket (HAY)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62683    
17/09/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 62683    

prev prev