Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 287 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2556 Week
» 21457 Month
» 21457 Year
» 1686833 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6391 m/e 10/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2684 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 62684 m/e 02/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1924 WIZARD OF THE MOOR

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Works Number 606
To Service During 10/1924
Withdrawal Thu 29/10/1959
Scrapping During 02/1960 at Arnott Young (Carmyle)
Service Life 35 yrs , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1924
EFD Eastfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 29/10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 18/05/1957
WDN   on 29/10/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1943 Long Travel Valves fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
24/08/1947 Cowlairs Works On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. SLS/194710
07/09/1947 Eastfield MPD Nos. 4852 an 4927 (both BLA) were observed here on 7/9, awaiting shops. Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during September are: Nos. *1734/*1782, 1855, 2476/89, *2684/*2687, 2702, 4548, 4636, 4840/49, 4916/19/23/28, 5901/8/9/12, 7453/66, 7600, 8122, 8328, 8468/80, 9133, 9214/16 an 9564, whilst those observed on 1/10 were: *1732, 2455/73, 4578, 4865, 4922 an 9160 . *Painted green. On 11/10 'J83' No. 8474 was on shed, being ex Works and painted green. This engine now has a Gresham and Craven type 'P' solid jet ejector and an old (trigger) pattern steam brake valve. 'J37' No. 4546 has L.M.S. type water gauge frames with Dewrance protectors. SLS/194711
31/01/1950 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 60152, 61072, 61117/18, 61307, 1751, 61764, 1780, 61784, 2474/76/88, 2684/94, 62733, 3058, 3168, 64575, 4586, 64621/28/36, 4786, 64877/80, 4919/40, 65923, 5924, 65932, 7453/80, 68100, 8323/44, 9170, 9214, 9507, 69595, 90505, ex-W.D. 77089, 77231, 73792. SLS/195003
08/10/1955 North Eastern Miscellany Class B16 engines have now appeared at sheds in the Newcastle-upon-Tyne area and the following have been noted working between Heaton and Berwick on various classes of trains: 61410/13/14/15/40/67/69. Class K2 2-6-0 locos noted en route between Newcastle and Cowlairs recently for overhaul and repainting have been Nos. 61720/27/62/65. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73101 worked a Newcastle-Berwick passenger train on the 21st Sept. en route for the Scottish Region. Class J21 0-6-0 Nos. 65117 an 65070 were hauled dead by a Class J39 for the north on 4/10 and a class Dll 4-4-0 62684 hauled Class K1 62031 dead from Haymarket shed to Gateshead on October 5th. During mid-October, Class D49 4-4-0 Nos. 62752 an 62720 have been observed working a morning Sunderland-Newcastle slow passenger train as a running-in turn, both engines being recently ex-works. SLS/195512

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1924 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 6391, name: WIZARD OF THE MOOR
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 606
   
05/1943 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2684    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 62684    
29/10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 62684    

prev prev