Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 265 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5876 Week
» 16922 Month
» 16922 Year
» 1682298 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6392 m/e 10/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2685 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 62685 m/e 05/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1924 MALCOLM GRAEME

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Works Number 607
To Service During 10/1924
Withdrawal Mon 15/01/1962
Scrapping During 07/1963
Service Life 37 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1924
HAY Haymarket on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 15/01/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 15/01/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1941 Long Travel Valves fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/10/1947 Eastfield MPD Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during October were: Nos. 1743/46/51/68, *1791 (green), 1879, 2432/62/73/95, 2685/91 (both green), 4526/65/67/98, 4607, 4703/04, 4852, 4926/28/42, 5345, 7461/69/97, *8474 (green), 9147/91 an 9205; whilst those observed on 2/11 were *1995 (green), 4608, 4938 an 9500 . Nos. 1701, 1996 an 1998 were observed here fitted with snow-ploughs. Nos. 2479, 4474 an 4633 have been supplying steam to the canteen here during the period approximately from 15/10 to 26/10, while No. 5308 is again in use as a stationary boiler, after having been temporarily replaced by No. 5339. SLS/194712
29/07/1961 Stationary boilers 62685 is now in use as a stationary boiler at the Caledonian Hotel. 62496 is similar at Eastfield. SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1924 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 6392, name: MALCOLM GRAEME
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 607
   
03/1941 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2685    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Haymarket (HAY)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62685    
15/01/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 62685    

prev prev