Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 193 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2462 Week
» 21363 Month
» 21363 Year
» 1686739 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6393 m/e 10/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2686 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 62686 m/e 07/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1924 THE FIERY CROSS

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Works Number 608
To Service During 10/1924
Withdrawal Fri 28/07/1961
Scrapping During 08/1962
Service Life 36 yrs, 9 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1924
EFD Eastfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 28/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 18/05/1957
WDN   on 28/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1939 Long Travel Valves fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/06/1948 Cowlairs Works (Erecting Shop) Locomotives in the yard awaiting repair were Nos. 502, 1745, 2436/39, 4532, 4600, 4791, 5237, 5913, 8118, 8350, 8955, 9178, 9503/11, 61002 an 61735-the last two being lettered B.R. Locomotives in the Works were: Stripping Pit Nos. 1102, 9927; Erecting Shop Nos. 1116, 1774/75/77/92/94, 1885, 1916/95, 2686/90, 4524/50/60/89, 4821, 7492, 8567, 9126/45, 61767; Steaming Pits Nos. 1787, 4925, 61134, 61292, 69206; Paint Shop Nos. 1101, 1783. 61292 is fitted with ex L.M.S. tablet catcher and is to be used on Perth-Inverness trials. SLS/194808

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1924 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 6393, name: THE FIERY CROSS
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 608
   
04/1939 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2686    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62686    
28/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 62686    

prev prev