Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 299 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5910 Week
» 16956 Month
» 16956 Year
» 1682332 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6394 m/e 10/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2687 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 62687 m/e 09/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1924 LORD JAMES OF DOUGLAS

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Works Number 609
To Service During 10/1924
Withdrawal Wed 02/08/1961
Scrapping During 01/1962
Service Life 36 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1924
EFD Eastfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 02/08/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC COL Colchester on 07/12/1946
WDN   on 02/08/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1943 Long Travel Valves fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
24/08/1947 Cowlairs Works On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. SLS/194710
07/09/1947 Eastfield MPD Nos. 4852 an 4927 (both BLA) were observed here on 7/9, awaiting shops. Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during September are: Nos. *1734/*1782, 1855, 2476/89, *2684/*2687, 2702, 4548, 4636, 4840/49, 4916/19/23/28, 5901/8/9/12, 7453/66, 7600, 8122, 8328, 8468/80, 9133, 9214/16 an 9564, whilst those observed on 1/10 were: *1732, 2455/73, 4578, 4865, 4922 an 9160 . *Painted green. On 11/10 'J83' No. 8474 was on shed, being ex Works and painted green. This engine now has a Gresham and Craven type 'P' solid jet ejector and an old (trigger) pattern steam brake valve. 'J37' No. 4546 has L.M.S. type water gauge frames with Dewrance protectors. SLS/194711
27/08/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60502/05, 61081, 61727, 1729, 61736/46, 1753, 61759/83/91, 1823, 61876/78, 61988/93, 2428, 62683, 2687, 62688, 3180, 4546/47/64/79, 4703, 64855, 4945/86, 65913, 67478, 68113, 8321, 8477, 68481, 8544, 68955, 69183, 69213, 77306, ex L.M.S. 40170, 44795, 45022, 45451, 54654. During W/E 20/8 Cowlairs started putting the crest on both passenger and goods tender engines which had received a general repair (not intermediate repair) and the following have been noted: Nos. 61308, 61766, 64700 an 90313; no tank engines have so far been noted with the crest-No. 68477 appeared in lined black, with British Railways on the tanks. SLS/194910

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1924 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 6394, name: LORD JAMES OF DOUGLAS
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 609
   
07/1943 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2687    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62687    
02/08/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 62687    

prev prev