Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 493 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6104 Week
» 17150 Month
» 17150 Year
» 1682526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6395 m/e 11/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2688 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 62688 m/e 09/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/1924 ELLEN DOUGLAS

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Works Number 610
To Service During 11/1924
Withdrawal Fri 28/07/1961
Scrapping During 09/1961
Service Life 36 yrs, 8 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1924
EFD Eastfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 28/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 18/05/1957
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   on 28/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
27/08/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60502/05, 61081, 61727, 1729, 61736/46, 1753, 61759/83/91, 1823, 61876/78, 61988/93, 2428, 62683, 2687, 62688, 3180, 4546/47/64/79, 4703, 64855, 4945/86, 65913, 67478, 68113, 8321, 8477, 68481, 8544, 68955, 69183, 69213, 77306, ex L.M.S. 40170, 44795, 45022, 45451, 54654. During W/E 20/8 Cowlairs started putting the crest on both passenger and goods tender engines which had received a general repair (not intermediate repair) and the following have been noted: Nos. 61308, 61766, 64700 an 90313; no tank engines have so far been noted with the crest-No. 68477 appeared in lined black, with British Railways on the tanks. SLS/194910
30/06/1950 Cowlairs Works Engines into shops: 1131, 1752, 3115, 4596, 4846, 4933, 5922, 5927, 7473, 8442, 8460, 8463, 8468, 8474, 8475, 8479, 9171, 61146, 61180, 61879, 61911, 62478, 62496, 62688, 63038, 63151, 64539, 64566, 64573, 64607, 64626, 64632, 64821, 64925, 64964, 67617, 68957, 69214, 69565, 77375, 77456, 90496. SLS/195008

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1924 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 6395, name: ELLEN DOUGLAS
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 610
   
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2688    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62688    
28/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 62688    

prev prev