Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 88 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 88 Week
» 26709 Month
» 26709 Year
» 1692085 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6396 m/e 11/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2689 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 62689 m/e 07/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/1924 MAID OF LORN

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Works Number 611
To Service During 11/1924
Withdrawal Thu 13/07/1961
Scrapping During 08/1961
Service Life 36 yrs, 8 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1924
EFD Eastfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64A St Margarets 4w/e 13/02/1960
65A Eastfield 4w/e 02/07/1960
   Withdrawn on 13/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 13/02/1960
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 02/07/1960
WDN   on 13/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. SLS/194908
11/03/1961 Polmont MPD (in store) On 11th Mch. the following were in store-62682/9/90/1/3, 64482/515/8/32/5, 68448/54/71/2, 69014. SLS/196104
13/05/1961 Bo\'ness MPD In store beyond the station beside the now closed dock-54475/83, 55222, 56169, 56370, 57245/57/64/85/7, 57338/66/73, 57411/26/9/70, 57557/76, 62689, 64471/82, 64515/35, 68325/454. SLS/196106

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1924 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 6396, name: MAID OF LORN
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 611
   
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2689    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62689    
13/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
02/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
13/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 62689    

prev prev