Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 52 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 52 Week
» 7664 Month
» 74526 Year
» 1739902 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6397 m/e 11/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2690 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 62690 m/e 07/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/1924 THE LADY OF THE LAKE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Works Number 612
To Service During 11/1924
Withdrawal Thu 13/07/1961
Service Life 36 yrs, 8 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1924
HAY   Haymarket on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 13/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   on 13/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/06/1948 Cowlairs Works (Erecting Shop) Locomotives in the yard awaiting repair were Nos. 502, 1745, 2436/39, 4532, 4600, 4791, 5237, 5913, 8118, 8350, 8955, 9178, 9503/11, 61002 an 61735-the last two being lettered B.R. Locomotives in the Works were: Stripping Pit Nos. 1102, 9927; Erecting Shop Nos. 1116, 1774/75/77/92/94, 1885, 1916/95, 2686/90, 4524/50/60/89, 4821, 7492, 8567, 9126/45, 61767; Steaming Pits Nos. 1787, 4925, 61134, 61292, 69206; Paint Shop Nos. 1101, 1783. 61292 is fitted with ex L.M.S. tablet catcher and is to be used on Perth-Inverness trials. SLS/194808
11/03/1961 Polmont MPD (in store) On 11th Mch. the following were in store-62682/9/90/1/3, 64482/515/8/32/5, 68448/54/71/2, 69014. SLS/196104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1924 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 6397, name: THE LADY OF THE LAKE
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 612
   
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2690    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Haymarket (HAY)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62690    
13/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 62690    
09/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev