Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1009 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 1009 Week
» 19910 Month
» 19910 Year
» 1685286 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6399 m/e 11/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2692 m/e 01/1947
British Railways 62692 m/e 01/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/1924 ALLAN-BANE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Works Number 614
To Service During 11/1924
Withdrawal Mon 16/11/1959
Scrapping During 02/1960 at Arnott Young (Carmyle)
Service Life 35 yrs , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1924
HAY Haymarket on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64F Bathgate 8w/e 21/03/1953
64B Haymarket 4w/e 13/06/1953
   Withdrawn on 16/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 64B Haymarket 4w/e 13/06/1953
WDN   on 16/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1949 Long Travel Valves fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1946 General At this date (30/11/1946) only the following Scottish Area engines still require to be renumbered: 4488, 4491, 2745, 4819, 4891, 4898, 3658, 3682, 3692, 1996, 9765, 6897, 3057, 9499, 9886, 9384, 6398, 6399, 6401, 265, 320, 9201, 9204, 9368, 9255, 9263, 9429, 9046, 2980, 9632, 9644, 9668, 9757, 9790, 7348, 9524, 9527; a total of 37, or 3 per cent. of the total stock SLS/194701
31/12/1946 Queens Park Works During December twelve new Class 'B1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1102-1113 inclusive (74 in 8&nfrac12; months), No. 1111 being the N.B. Loco. Co.'s 'Christmas present' to the L.N.E.R.-it was ex Works on 25.12.46! No. 1112 was ex Works 27.12.46, and 1113 on either Mon-day 30th or Tuesday 31st, before the Works closed down for the New Year holidays. 1111 ran trials on 28/12, and on 4/1/47 was observed working the 2.25 p.m. Glasgow-Edinburgh train. Works Nos. checked are as follows: 1106 (25859/46), 1107 (26861/46), 1109 (25865/46), 1110 (25866/46), 1111 (25867/46), 1112 (25868/46). It will be noted there is further confusion. On 23/12 1114 was noted in Q.P. Works Erecting Shop with Works plates 25870/46, although 1113 had no plates fitted. The Maker's plates are not usually fitted until the engine is in the Paint Shop. On the above date up to 1116 (which only lacked wheels), were noted in the Works. 1111 and 1112 were in the Paint Shop. No. 6399 'D.11' 'Allan-Bane' was noted at Eastfleld on 2/1/47 still un-Renumbered. This must be one of the very few not yet renumbered in Scotland. The last one noted was 'J6' 9668 in Cowlairs Works Yard on 7/12/46, and 'V.2' 4819 on the same day. 9668 has since appeared as 5240. SLS/194702
09/07/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. SLS/194908

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1924 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 6399, name: ALLAN-BANE
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 614
   
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 2692    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Haymarket (HAY)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62692    
07/1949 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
13/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
16/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 62692    

prev prev