Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 309 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5920 Week
» 16966 Month
» 16966 Year
» 1682342 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6400 m/e 11/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2693 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 62693 m/e 05/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/1924 RODERICK DHU

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Works Number 615
To Service During 11/1924
Withdrawal Mon 20/11/1961
Scrapping During 03/1963
Service Life 37 yrs , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1924
HAY Haymarket on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64A St Margarets 4w/e 13/02/1960
64B Haymarket 4w/e 02/07/1960
   Withdrawn on 20/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 13/02/1960
ALLOC 64B Haymarket 4w/e 02/07/1960
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   on 20/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1941 Long Travel Valves fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/03/1961 Polmont MPD (in store) On 11th Mch. the following were in store-62682/9/90/1/3, 64482/515/8/32/5, 68448/54/71/2, 69014. SLS/196104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1924 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 6400, name: RODERICK DHU
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 615
   
07/1941 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2693    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Haymarket (HAY)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62693    
13/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
02/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
20/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 62693    

prev prev