Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 968 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 968 Week
» 19869 Month
» 19869 Year
» 1685245 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6401 m/e 11/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2694 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 62694 m/e 02/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/1924 JAMES FITZJAMES

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Large/Scottish Director
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Works Number 616
To Service During 11/1924
Withdrawal Mon 16/11/1959
Scrapping During 02/1960 at Arnott Young (Carmyle)
Service Life 35 yrs , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1924
HAY Haymarket on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 16/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 16/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1942 Long Travel Valves fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1946 General At this date (30/11/1946) only the following Scottish Area engines still require to be renumbered: 4488, 4491, 2745, 4819, 4891, 4898, 3658, 3682, 3692, 1996, 9765, 6897, 3057, 9499, 9886, 9384, 6398, 6399, 6401, 265, 320, 9201, 9204, 9368, 9255, 9263, 9429, 9046, 2980, 9632, 9644, 9668, 9757, 9790, 7348, 9524, 9527; a total of 37, or 3 per cent. of the total stock SLS/194701
31/01/1950 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 60152, 61072, 61117/18, 61307, 1751, 61764, 1780, 61784, 2474/76/88, 2684/94, 62733, 3058, 3168, 64575, 4586, 64621/28/36, 4786, 64877/80, 4919/40, 65923, 5924, 65932, 7453/80, 68100, 8323/44, 9170, 9214, 9507, 69595, 90505, ex-W.D. 77089, 77231, 73792. SLS/195003

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1924 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 6401, name: JAMES FITZJAMES
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 616
   
05/1942 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2694    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Haymarket (HAY)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 62694    
16/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 62694    

prev