Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1391 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19194 Week
» 72210 Month
» 191737 Year
» 3218590 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1882 |
m/e |
05/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8882 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7752 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2513 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
62513 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D14 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
M51 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 05/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 03/11/1958 off Cambridge (31A) |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 6 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1919 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 27 boiler fitted |
02/1919 |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
11/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
05/1933 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
05/1936 |
GNR style Chimney fitted |
09/1942 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
09/1942 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1882 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
02/1919 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted |
|
|
02/1919 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 27 boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8882 |
|
|
11/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
05/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
05/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7752 but not taken up |
|
|
09/1942 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1942 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2513 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62513 |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
13/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
03/11/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62513 from Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
12/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|