Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 3834 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17240 Week
» 70256 Month
» 189783 Year
» 3216636 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1870 |
m/e |
03/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8870 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7740 |
m/e |
12/1942 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2521 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
British Railways |
62521 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D14 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
F53 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 03/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 10/02/1958 off Kings Lynn (31C) |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 11 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1924 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
04/1924 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 27 boiler fitted |
04/1924 |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
06/1928 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
05/1935 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
05/1935 |
Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1870 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8870 |
|
|
04/1924 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 27 boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
06/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
05/1935 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1942 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7740 |
|
|
17/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2521 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Yarmouth South Town (YAR) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62521 |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
19/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
10/02/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62521 from Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
04/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|