Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4130 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17536 Week
» 70552 Month
» 190079 Year
» 3216932 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1875 |
m/e |
04/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8875 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7745 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2526 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
62526 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D14 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
F53 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 04/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 21/05/1957 off March (31B) |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 1 mth , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1902 |
IPS |
|
Ipswich |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
31B |
|
March |
4w/e |
20/06/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
21/05/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
13/06/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
21/05/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1924 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
03/1931 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
03/1931 |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
05/1936 |
GNR style Chimney fitted |
08/1937 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
08/1937 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1875 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8875 |
|
|
06/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
03/1931 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
05/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted |
|
|
08/1937 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7745 but not taken up |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2526 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62526 |
|
|
20/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
21/05/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62526 from March (31B) |
|
|
09/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|