Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 785 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18588 Week
» 71604 Month
» 191131 Year
» 3217984 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1861 |
m/e |
05/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8861 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7731 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2532 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
62532 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D14 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
L55 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 05/1903 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 12/11/1956 off Cambridge (31A) |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 6 mths , 13 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1921 |
Saturated Diagram 27 Boiler Fitted |
01/1921 |
Diagram 27Sat boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
06/1927 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
11/1929 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
11/1929 |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
04/1936 |
9 ½" Piston Valves fitted |
04/1936 |
Decorative Valance over driving wheels removed |
04/1936 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
04/1936 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1861 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
01/1921 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sat boiler fitted |
|
|
01/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated Diagram 27 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8861 |
|
|
06/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
11/1929 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
04/1936 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: 9 ½" Piston Valves fitted |
|
|
04/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels removed |
|
|
04/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7731 but not taken up |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2532 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62532 |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
30/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
21/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
19/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
12/11/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62532 from Cambridge (31A) |
|
|