Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2652 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16058 Week
» 69074 Month
» 188601 Year
» 3215454 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1869 |
m/e |
11/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8869 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7739 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2540 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
62540 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D14 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
L55 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 11/1903 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 24/08/1959 off Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1922 |
Saturated Diagram 27 Boiler Fitted |
01/1922 |
Diagram 27Sat boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
02/1924 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 27 boiler fitted |
02/1924 |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
07/1928 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
07/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
06/1934 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
06/1934 |
Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1869 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
01/1922 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sat boiler fitted |
|
|
01/1922 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated Diagram 27 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8869 |
|
|
02/1924 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted |
|
|
02/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 27 boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
07/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
06/1934 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7739 but not taken up |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2540 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Yarmouth South Town (YAR) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62540 |
|
|
26/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (YB) |
|
|
30/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR) |
|
|
30/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
24/08/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62540 from Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
09/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|