|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1958 | Stratford Works (Waiting Cut Up) | Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1854 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
||
06/1916 | Modification | Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted | ||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8854 | ||
05/1929 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
03/1933 | Modification | Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted | ||
03/1933 | Modification | Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted | ||
1942 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 7724 but not taken up | ||
08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2545 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
15/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR) | ||
07/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
21/08/1948 | Allocation | |||
30/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
25/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) | ||
22/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
02/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 62545 | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
19/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
20/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
20/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) | ||
20/03/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
19/03/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) | ||
20/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
19/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) | ||
22/09/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62545 from Kings Lynn (31C) | ||
12/1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped |