Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1469 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19272 Week
» 72288 Month
» 191815 Year
» 3218668 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1841 |
m/e |
11/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8841 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7711 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2552 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
62552 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G61 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 11/1906 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 25/10/1955 off Ipswich (32B) |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 11 mths , 24 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
32B |
Ipswich |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
ALLOC |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
4w/e |
13/06/1953 |
ALLOC |
32B |
Ipswich |
4w/e |
19/06/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
25/10/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1929 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
01/1929 |
Diagram 26 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
04/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1949 |
Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
02/1949 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
02/1949 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1841 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8841 |
|
|
01/1929 |
Modification |
Diagram 26 boiler fitted |
|
|
01/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
04/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7711 but not taken up |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2552 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
02/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
|
|
02/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62552 |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
20/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
25/10/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62552 from Ipswich (32B) |
|
|