Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3053 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16459 Week
» 69475 Month
» 189002 Year
» 3215855 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1831 |
m/e |
03/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8831 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7701 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2562 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
62562 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A64 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 03/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 22/10/1957 off March (31B) |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 7 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1916 |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
04/1928 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
04/1928 |
Diagram 26 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
08/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1946 |
Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
02/1946 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
02/1946 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1831 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1916 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8831 |
|
|
04/1928 |
Modification |
Diagram 26 boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
08/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR) |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7701 but not taken up |
|
|
02/1946 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
02/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
|
|
02/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2562 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Melton Constable (MC) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62562 |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
19/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
23/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
20/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
20/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
22/10/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62562 from March (31B) |
|
|
11/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|