Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1900 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19703 Week
» 72719 Month
» 192246 Year
» 3219099 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1828 |
m/e |
12/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8828 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7698 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2579 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
62579 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
B66 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 12/1909 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 07/03/1955 off Kings Lynn (31C) |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
m/e |
31/03/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/03/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 1924 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
06/1928 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
06/1928 |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
03/1934 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
03/1934 |
Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1828 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8828 |
|
|
06/1928 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
03/1934 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1933) boiler fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7698 but not taken up |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2579 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62579 |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
07/03/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62579 from Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|