Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3732 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17138 Week
» 70154 Month
» 189681 Year
» 3216534 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1829 |
m/e |
12/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8829 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7699 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2580 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
62580 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
B66 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 12/1909 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 09/06/1958 off Kings Lynn (31C) |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 6 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1958 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
09/06/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 1924 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1930 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
02/1930 |
Diagram 26 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
04/1948 |
Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
04/1948 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
04/1948 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/06/1958 |
Stratford MPD |
On 29th June, the following were awaiting scrap-62536/80, 62788/97, 65442, 65508/34/5/74, 67195/212/27/30/1, 68490/1/4/5/546/55/68/607/32. In the previous week, 69496, 69609/43 were cut up. |
SLS/195807 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1829 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8829 |
|
|
02/1930 |
Modification |
Diagram 26 boiler fitted |
|
|
02/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7699 but not taken up |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2580 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Yarmouth South Town (YAR) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
|
|
04/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62580 |
|
|
19/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
09/06/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62580 from Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
07/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|