Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4142 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17548 Week
» 70564 Month
» 190091 Year
» 3216944 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1813 |
m/e |
04/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8813 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7683 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2584 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
62584 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
D67 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 04/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 23/12/1957 off Kings Lynn (31C) |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1958 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
23/06/1956 |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/12/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1914 |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
04/1926 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
04/1926 |
Diagram 26 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
08/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
09/1947 |
Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
09/1947 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
09/1947 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/09/1947 |
Stratford Works |
The following withdrawn locos. were noted in the vicinity of the stripping shop on 25/9: 'F3' 7118/21/29/38/45; 'B12/3' 1522; 'D16/3' 2500; 'J15' 5358 an 5403 (all stripped), whilst 7125 an 7148 were intact. Other locos. stripped were: 'J15' 5402/54; 'D16' 2535; 'J17' 5541/71. In the stripping shop were: 'E4' 2784; 'J15' 5472; 'J19/2' 4675 and 'J17' 5549. In the Paint shop were the 'Coffee Pot' 'Y5' 8081 and W.D. 77416. A curious sight was the crane tank shed filled by two W.D.'s 77119 an 77312 (the latter with a 15A shed plate). In the fields behind the New Works were 'F3' 7146; 'J70' 8225; 'H2' 7512; 'D16' 2591; 'B12' 1544 and 'J39' 4841, all awaiting works. W.D. 77476 was in the New Works, and W.D.'s 77302 and 77107 were in the shed yard. 'D16' 2584; 'J20' 4677/93; 'J39' 4708/61, 'J69' 8574/8632; 'F6' 7230 and 'F4' 7162 were all noted newly painted ex-works. 7162 was fitted with a tablet-catcher. |
SLS/194711 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1813 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1914 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8813 |
|
|
04/1926 |
Modification |
Diagram 26 boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
08/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7683 but not taken up |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2584 |
|
|
09/1947 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
|
|
09/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
22/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62584 |
|
|
21/07/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
19/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
23/12/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62584 from Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
02/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|