Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 648 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 1664 Week
» 19716 Month
» 252636 Year
» 1918012 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 1805 m/e 09/1910
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 8805 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) 7672 y/e Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2596 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 62596 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D15
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Claud Hamilton09/1910
D16/103/1923
D16/2 (4-4-0)11/1931
D16/3 (4-4-0)03/1947
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number P67
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 09/1910
Withdrawal Mon 28/10/1957 off Norwich Thorpe (32A)
Service Life 47 yrs, 1 mth , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1957

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1910
YB   Yarmouth Beach on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32A   Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 20/09/1952
32A   Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 04/10/1952
32G   Melton Constable 4w/e 19/12/1953
32A   Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 23/01/1954
     Withdrawn on 28/10/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 32G Melton Constable 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 23/01/1954
WDN   on 28/10/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1923 Diagram 26 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox)
06/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
11/1931 Extended Smokebox fitted
03/1947 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted
03/1947 Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)
03/1947 Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1942 L.N.E.R. Notes (March Area) March Area.-'V.2's' appear quite often, the following having been noted in Oct./Nov.: 4772/96, 4813/7. 'J.17' 8195 has been fitted with carriage heating and vacuum brake. 2859 East Anglian was here 31/10/42 fresh from Plant. It has ordinary whistle. A 'Pacific' visits us regularly on Sundays, examples noted being 4472/4 an 2571. 'E.4's' 7408/16/66/92 an 7503 are stationed here for working on the Joint line to Spalding, &c.-the first ones shedded here for a long time. Our regular station pilot 8062 is often in shops and its place is taken by 'D.16' 8805 or by 'D.9' or 'J.15' classes. SLS/194302

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1910 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1805
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
03/1923 Modification Diagram 26 boiler fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8805    
06/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
11/1931 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7672 but not taken up    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2596    
03/1947 Modification Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted    
03/1947 Modification Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding    
03/1947 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Yarmouth Beach (YB)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62596    
20/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G)    
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
28/10/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 62596 from Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
11/1957 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev