Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 43 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 861 Week
» 17812 Month
» 170765 Year
» 1836141 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 1807 m/e 10/1910
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 8807 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) 7677 y/e Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2598 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 62598 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class D15
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Claud Hamilton10/1910
D16/3 (4-4-0)01/1942
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number P67
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 10/1910
Withdrawal Mon 12/05/1952 off Norwich Thorpe (32A)
Service Life 41 yrs, 7 mths , 12 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1910
COL   Colchester on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32A   Norwich Thorpe w/e 26/05/1951
32A   Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 23/06/1951
     Withdrawn on 12/05/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 26/05/1951
WDN   on 12/05/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1914 Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox)
01/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted
12/1929 Extended Smokebox fitted
05/1936 GNR style Chimney fitted
01/1942 Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted
01/1942 Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1910 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1807
Built at Stratford Works
Diagram 28 boiler fitted
   
06/1914 Modification Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8807    
01/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
12/1929 Modification Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted    
05/1936 Modification Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7677 but not taken up    
01/1942 Modification Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted    
01/1942 Modification Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2598    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62598    
26/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
12/05/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 62598 from Norwich Thorpe (32A)    

prev prev