|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1952 | Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) | Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). | SLS/195206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1911 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1795 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8795 | ||
05/1929 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
04/1931 | Modification | Diagram 26 boiler fitted | ||
04/1931 | Modification | Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted | ||
12/1942 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7665 | ||
07/1944 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8795 | ||
03/1946 | Modification | Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted | ||
03/1946 | Modification | Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding | ||
03/1946 | Modification | Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted | ||
11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2606 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) | ||
27/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Lynn (KL) | ||
25/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
26/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) | ||
06/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 62606 | ||
30/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
20/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) | ||
28/09/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62606 from Kings Lynn (31C) | ||
11/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |