Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 648 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18451 Week
» 71467 Month
» 190994 Year
» 3217847 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1797 |
m/e |
07/1911 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8797 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7667 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2608 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
62608 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
E69 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 07/1911 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 01/01/1957 off Cambridge (31A) |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 6 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1914 |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
04/1928 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
09/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
05/1936 |
GNR style Chimney fitted |
07/1937 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
07/1937 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1911 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1797 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1914 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8797 |
|
|
04/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
09/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
05/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted |
|
|
07/1937 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7667 but not taken up |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2608 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62608 |
|
|
26/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
19/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
22/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
01/01/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62608 from Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
02/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|