Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 401 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14444 Week
» 79398 Month
» 282062 Year
» 3308915 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1781 |
m/e |
06/1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8781 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7651 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2612 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
62612 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
D16 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
H88 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 06/1923 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 24/11/1959 off Kirkby in Ashfield (16B) |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1928 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
08/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
04/1949 |
Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
04/1949 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
04/1949 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/05/1959 |
Peterborough Spital Bridge MPD |
. D16s have been re-transferred to Spital Bridge (former MR shed) and are on passenger turns to Northampton and Leicester-62597 an 62612/3 have been so noted. |
SLS/195907 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1923 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1781 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 26 boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8781 |
|
|
08/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
08/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7651 but not taken up |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2612 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
23/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
22/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|
26/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding |
|
|
04/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62612 |
|
|
30/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
18/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (31F) |
|
|
24/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62612 from Kirkby in Ashfield (16B) |
|
|
01/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|