|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1958 | Stratford Works (Waiting Cut Up) | Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1923 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1784 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 26 boiler fitted |
||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8784 | ||
06/1927 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
06/1929 | Modification | Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted | ||
1942 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 7654 but not taken up | ||
11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2615 | ||
04/1947 | Modification | Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted | ||
04/1947 | Modification | Modification: Decorative Valance over driving wheels retained after rebuilding | ||
04/1947 | Modification | Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Bury St Edmunds (BSE) | ||
03/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 62615 | ||
21/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
23/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) | ||
06/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) | ||
20/07/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
13/10/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62615 from March (31B) | ||
12/1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped |