Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 4047 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17453 Week
» 70469 Month
» 189996 Year
» 3216849 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2023 |
m/e |
09/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2352 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
62352 |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
D20 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 09/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 29/06/1954 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 9 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1954 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
4w/e |
13/06/1953 |
ALLOC |
52DALN |
|
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
52A |
Gateshead |
4w/e |
19/06/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/06/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1921 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
03/1947 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 59A Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1900 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2023 Built at Gateshead Works |
|
|
09/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2352 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 59A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tweedmouth (TWD) |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62352 |
|
|
20/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
29/06/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62352 |
|
|
07/1954 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|