Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 88 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14131 Week
» 79085 Month
» 281749 Year
» 3308602 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2026 |
m/e |
10/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2355 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
62355 |
w/e |
04/03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
D20 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 10/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/11/1955 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BRI |
Bridlington |
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
ALLOC |
52DALN |
|
w/e |
09/06/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/11/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1912 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
01/1947 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 59A Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1900 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2026 Built at Gateshead Works |
|
|
11/1912 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2355 |
|
|
01/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 59A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) |
|
|
22/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bridlington (BRI) |
|
|
04/03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62355 |
|
|
09/06/1951 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) |
|
|
14/11/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62355 |
|
|
12/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|