30/06/1951 |
Locomotives still not renumbered |
Although it is well over three years since the B.R. renumbering scheme was introduced, there were several classes with a small percentage still not renumbered (or at any rate not advised as done) at the end of June-Class B16 (69 survivors): Nos. 1419/23/33. Class D20 (28 survivors): Nos. 2360/72/95. Class Q5 (4 survivors): Nos. 3270, 3311/4/26. Of this large class, only 9 received B.R. numbers, the last to be done being 63313(2/12/48). None of the renumbered engines survives. Class Q6 is completely renumbered, No. 63342 having just been done. Class Q7 (15 engines): all done except. No. 3460. Class J21 (37 survivors): all done except 5025, 5117/22. Class J24 (6 survivors): not renumbered are 5623 (Scotland) and 5644. Class J25 (57 survivors): all done except 5663/7/86, 5727. (5699 has become 65699 but no trace of advice). Class J26 was completed on 19/5/51 when 65769 was done. Class J27 (115 engines): all done except 5890/4. Class G5 (106 survivors): all renumbered by 31/3/51. Class J71 (76 survivors): twelve to be done, Nos. 8230/1/9/47/9/51/4/72/98, 8304/11/6-an unusually large percentage not dealt with. Class J77 (38 survivors): Nos. 8405/38 not renumbered. Class J72 (113 engines): to be renumbered 8672/81, 8730(?), 8748. Class N10 (19 survivors): all done (?except 9095). |
SLS/195108 |
31/03/1952 |
Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) |
Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). |
SLS/195206 |
29/01/1955 |
North eastern Miscellany |
Class D20 62372, looking clean and polished, has been working on local passenger turns between Sunderland and Newcastle during March. On Sunday, 20th March, trains between Sunderland and West Hartlepool were diverted via Wellfield, due to work on track maintenance on the main line, and the 5.0 p.m. train from Newcastle to Liverpool hauled by V2 60964 was piloted from Sunderland by G5 67328 to give assistance up Seaton bank which is 1 in 42 for about half a mile at its steepest. On Sunday, 26th March, class 5 45316 was noted descending Seaton bank with an excursion from the Midland Region. Locomotives used for football excursions to Sunderland on 30/3 included Nos. 76046. 61018 an 64851. |
SLS/195505 |
28/08/1956 |
North Eastern Miscellany |
On 28th August, 62372 an 62381 were noted on Selby shed, 62381 being in steam. On 9th September a Ramblers' Excursion was run from Leeds to Middleton-in-Teesdale. The main line engine was detached at Darlington and the train of eleven coaches was worked up the branch line to Middleton-in-Teesdale and back with 67638 (53B) piloted by 67789 (38E), both engines being ex works and resplendent in new paint. Repainted locomotives ex Gateshead Works noted on Thursday, 13th September, were 62022 an 68363. On the same day, 67639 (52C), subshedded at Hexham, was observed at the western end of Newcastle Central Station, much polished up with smokebox fittings embellished with aluminium paint and with safety valves, whistle and other brass fittings shining brightly. The work of replacing the semaphore type signalling at Newcastle Central Station with a modern colour light installation is now in an advanced state. Colour light signalling is already in operation for north bound traffic and the old semaphore signals have been dismantled. Work is now proceeding on the building of the new signal box in the middle of the station between platform ten and the goods lines. Part of the station roof has been removed and massive girders now span from above platform ten to the outer wall of the station on the south side. At the same time, work is proceeding on the erection of new colour light signals to control south bound traffic and when this installation is ready, the existing large signal gantry spanning the running lines at the west end of the station will be redundant and will be removed. |
SLS/195611 |