Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1490 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19293 Week
» 72309 Month
» 191836 Year
» 3218689 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
256 |
m/e |
09/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9256 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2469 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
62469 |
w/e |
24/12/1949 |
North British Railway (Pres) |
256 |
m/e |
08/1959 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
Glen |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram 78 (Round Top firebox) | Engine Brakes | Steam | Train Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 09/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 17/12/1962 |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
ALLOC |
61C |
Keith |
3w/e |
21/01/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1935 |
Gravity sanding fitted |
09/1935 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
09/1935 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1913 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 256, name: GLEN DOUGLAS Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
08/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9256 |
|
|
09/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Gravity sanding fitted |
|
|
09/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2469 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62469 |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
18/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
08/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 256 |
|
|
24/10/1959 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
27/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
17/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 256 |
|
|