Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 4 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5615 Week
» 16661 Month
» 16661 Year
» 1682037 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great North of Scotland Railway 115 m/e 10/1899
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6915 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2264 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 62264 w/e 17/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Pickersgill / T. Heywood
Class D40
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number E827
Works Number 5604
To Service During 10/1899
Withdrawal Tue 05/03/1957
Scrapping During 07/1957
Service Life 57 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1899
KEI Keith on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 05/03/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 05/03/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1951 G.N.O.S. Section - Keith In an afternoon's observation at the Junction B1's 61343/8/52, D41's 62231/56, D40's 62262, 62264/9, and B12/1 61508 were seen. The B1's were in excellent condition. The others were just clean. 62269 has a crest and also a tender cab. 62231 in plain black appeared hauling a director's special, since involved in a crash at Dalguise on 1st August. 61508 was still in green as was 61528 seen at Craigellachie Junction: The Aberdeen-Inverness and a goods were both worked from Keith by Cal. 4-4-0's of 60A. The station was in the process of being repainted. SLS/195109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1899 To Service To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 115
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 5604
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6915    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2264    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Keith (KEI)    
17/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62264    
05/03/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 62264    

prev prev