Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 3439 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17482 Week
» 82436 Month
» 285100 Year
» 3311953 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great North of Scotland Railway |
29 |
m/e |
07/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6829 |
m/e |
02/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2267 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
62267 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Pickersgill / T. Heywood |
Class |
D40 |
Company History |
GNSR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Inverurie Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 07/1909 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 10/08/1956 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 1 mth , 11 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1909 |
KEI |
|
Keith |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/08/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
KEI |
Keith |
on |
10/02/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/08/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 29 Built at Inverurie Works |
|
|
02/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6829 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2267 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Keith (KEI) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62267 |
|
|
10/08/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62267 |
|
|