Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 349 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18152 Week
» 71168 Month
» 190695 Year
» 3217548 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great North of Scotland Railway |
31 |
m/e |
06/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6831 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2268 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
62268 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Pickersgill / T. Heywood |
Class |
D40 |
Company History |
GNSR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Inverurie Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 06/1910 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Fri 06/07/1956 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1956 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1910 |
KIT |
|
Kittybrewster |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
61C |
|
Keith |
4w/e |
08/09/1951 |
61C |
|
Keith |
8w/e |
09/09/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
06/07/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
61C |
Keith |
4w/e |
08/09/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
06/07/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1952 |
Keith MPD |
Engines at Keith shed were 62231, 62225/42/56/65/8/9/72/5, 61502/7/8, 67292, 54473 an 57597. |
SLS/195208 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 31 Built at Inverurie Works |
|
|
11/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6831 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2268 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
18/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62268 |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
09/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
06/07/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62268 |
|
|
08/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|