Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 35 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5646 Week
» 16692 Month
» 16692 Year
» 1682068 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great North of Scotland Railway 36 m/e 08/1910
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6836 m/e 12/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2272 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 62272 w/e 04/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Pickersgill / T. Heywood
Class D40
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Inverurie Works
Order Number IV1501
To Service During 08/1910
Withdrawal During 04/1955
Scrapping During 04/1955
Service Life 44 yrs , 8 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1910
KIT Kittybrewster on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 04/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 01/12/1951
WDN   on 11/03/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1949 Inverurie Works Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 61503, 62272/75, 64496, 4505, 64536, 65242, 5329, ex-L.M.S. 15224, 16278, 17347, 17460, 17611. SLS/195002
19/03/1950 Inverurie Works In the yard on 19/3 were 'B.12' No. 61539, 'D.40' No. 62272, 'D.31' No. 62282 (Condemned, built Cowlairs 1890), 'J.36' No. 65294, 'J.72' No. 68717 and '2F' No. 57260 (built Neilson 1884). SLS/195004
31/07/1952 Keith MPD Engines at Keith shed were 62231, 62225/42/56/65/8/9/72/5, 61502/7/8, 67292, 54473 an 57597. SLS/195208

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1910 To Service To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 36
Built at Inverurie Works
   
12/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6836    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2272    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT)    
04/12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62272    
04/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 62272    

prev prev