Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 784 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 5256 Week
» 24157 Month
» 24157 Year
» 1689533 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great North of Scotland Railway 33 m/e 09/1913
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6833 m/e 08/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2269 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 62269 w/e 26/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Pickersgill / T. Heywood
Class D40
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Inverurie Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 09/1913
Withdrawal Fri 09/09/1955
Service Life 42 yrs , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1913
KIT Kittybrewster on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 09/09/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KEI Keith w/e 10/12/1949
WDN   on 09/09/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1951 G.N.O.S. Section - Keith In an afternoon's observation at the Junction B1's 61343/8/52, D41's 62231/56, D40's 62262, 62264/9, and B12/1 61508 were seen. The B1's were in excellent condition. The others were just clean. 62269 has a crest and also a tender cab. 62231 in plain black appeared hauling a director's special, since involved in a crash at Dalguise on 1st August. 61508 was still in green as was 61528 seen at Craigellachie Junction: The Aberdeen-Inverness and a goods were both worked from Keith by Cal. 4-4-0's of 60A. The station was in the process of being repainted. SLS/195109
31/07/1951 G.N.O.S. Section - Boat of Garten The Craigellachie-Boat of Garten train is now worked completely by 62277 (61B) Gordon Highlander. This train in the last two weeks has become very interesting in that it has been composed of a G.N.S. 1st/3rd corridor of 1898 and a N.E.R. 3rd brake clerestory. The S.O. 9.18 p.m. (picture house train) has also contained unusual coaches. A G.N.R. 3rd corridor and a G.C. 1st/3rd brake, the compartments of which contain original G.C. pictures, below which are details of the G.C. routes. The afternoon freight from Craigellachie now works right through to Aviemore and back the same day. D40's and 41's seen at 'The Boat' lately include 62225/30/41/2/8/62/9/71/7. SLS/195109
31/07/1952 Keith MPD Engines at Keith shed were 62231, 62225/42/56/65/8/9/72/5, 61502/7/8, 67292, 54473 an 57597. SLS/195208

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1913 To Service To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 33
Built at Inverurie Works
   
08/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6833    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2269    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT)    
26/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62269    
09/09/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 62269    

prev prev