Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 975 Today
» 1042 Yesterday
» 7492 Week
» 7492 Month
» 74354 Year
» 1739730 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great North of Scotland Railway 35 m/e 09/1914
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6835 m/e 10/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2271 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 62271 w/e 03/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Pickersgill / T. Heywood
Class D40
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Inverurie Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 09/1914
Withdrawal During 12/1956
Service Life 42 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1914
KIT   Kittybrewster on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
KEI   Keith w/e 12/03/1949
     Withdrawn m/e 12/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KEI Keith w/e 12/03/1949
WDN 61C Keith on 29/11/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1951 G.N.O.S. Section - Boat of Garten The Craigellachie-Boat of Garten train is now worked completely by 62277 (61B) Gordon Highlander. This train in the last two weeks has become very interesting in that it has been composed of a G.N.S. 1st/3rd corridor of 1898 and a N.E.R. 3rd brake clerestory. The S.O. 9.18 p.m. (picture house train) has also contained unusual coaches. A G.N.R. 3rd corridor and a G.C. 1st/3rd brake, the compartments of which contain original G.C. pictures, below which are details of the G.C. routes. The afternoon freight from Craigellachie now works right through to Aviemore and back the same day. D40's and 41's seen at 'The Boat' lately include 62225/30/41/2/8/62/9/71/7. SLS/195109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1914 To Service To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 35
Built at Inverurie Works
   
10/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6835    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2271    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT)    
03/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62271    
12/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (KEI)    
12/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 62271    

prev prev