Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 24 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 24 Week
» 7636 Month
» 74498 Year
» 1739874 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great North of Scotland Railway 34 m/e 03/1915
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6834 m/e 07/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2270 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 62270 w/e 01/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Pickersgill / T. Heywood
Class D40
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Inverurie Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 03/1915
Withdrawal Thu 24/09/1953
Service Life 38 yrs, 6 mths , 26 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1915
KIT   Kittybrewster on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61C   Keith 4w/e 04/11/1951
61A   Kittybrewster 4w/e 18/04/1953
     Withdrawn on 24/09/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 04/11/1951
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 18/04/1953
WDN   on 24/09/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1915 To Service To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 34
Built at Inverurie Works
   
07/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6834    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2270    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT)    
01/01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62270    
04/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
24/09/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 62270    

prev prev