Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 43 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5654 Week
» 16700 Month
» 16700 Year
» 1682076 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great North of Scotland Railway 47 m/e 09/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6847 m/e 07/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2275 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 62275 w/e 31/07/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/1920 SIR DAVID STEWART

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Pickersgill / T. Heywood
Class D40
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L730
Works Number 22561
To Service During 09/1920
Withdrawal Fri 23/12/1955
Service Life 35 yrs, 3 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1920
KIT Kittybrewster on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61C Keith 8w/e 19/04/1952
   Withdrawn on 23/12/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 19/04/1952
WDN   on 23/12/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/08/1947 Inverurie Works On 20/8 the following locos. were in the Works yard: 'D31' 2071, 'J36' (Number painted out but carrying plate 9653 - identified as 5229), old No. 'D41' 6879 (old No.), 'J36' 5251/72/87/91, 5302/32/36 (the latter marked 'scrap') 'G10' 7505, all complete; whilst those stripped were: 'D40' 2266/80, 'D31' (bearing plate 9765, old No.), 2067, 'J36' 5212/19. Locos. in the Works were 'D40' 2262/75, 'D41' 2234/42/44, 'J35' 4463/82/84, 'J36' 5257/69/84, 5325, while 'D41' 2256 and 'G5' 7287 were ex Works freshly painted. SLS/194710
31/12/1949 Inverurie Works Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 61503, 62272/75, 64496, 4505, 64536, 65242, 5329, ex-L.M.S. 15224, 16278, 17347, 17460, 17611. SLS/195002
31/03/1950 Inverurie Works Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 62275, 4479/80, 64489, 65222/41/50/94, ex-L.M.S. Nos. 4181, 4257, 15198, 15234, 55263. 16251, 16325, 17357, 17405/33. SLS/195005
31/07/1952 Keith MPD Engines at Keith shed were 62231, 62225/42/56/65/8/9/72/5, 61502/7/8, 67292, 54473 an 57597. SLS/195208

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1920 To Service To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 47, name: SIR DAVID STEWART
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22561
   
07/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6847    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2275    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT)    
31/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62275    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
23/12/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 62275    

prev prev