Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 826 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 5298 Week
» 24199 Month
» 24199 Year
» 1689575 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great North of Scotland Railway 49 m/e 10/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6849 m/e 12/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2277 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 62277 w/e 13/11/1948
Great North of Scotland Railway (Pres) 49 m/e 07/1958

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1920 GORDON HIGHLANDER

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Pickersgill / T. Heywood
Class D40
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L730
Works Number 22563
To Service During 10/1920
Withdrawal Mon 23/06/1958
Service Life 37 yrs, 8 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1920
KIT Kittybrewster on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61C Keith 4w/e 14/07/1951
   Withdrawn on 23/06/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 14/07/1951
WDN   on 23/06/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1950 Inverurie Works Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 61539/60, 62277, 4486, 65215/31, 5271, 5318, 67455, ex-L.M.S. 40670, 15176, 15269, 17241, 17396, 17609. SLS/195006
31/07/1951 G.N.O.S. Section - Boat of Garten The Craigellachie-Boat of Garten train is now worked completely by 62277 (61B) Gordon Highlander. This train in the last two weeks has become very interesting in that it has been composed of a G.N.S. 1st/3rd corridor of 1898 and a N.E.R. 3rd brake clerestory. The S.O. 9.18 p.m. (picture house train) has also contained unusual coaches. A G.N.R. 3rd corridor and a G.C. 1st/3rd brake, the compartments of which contain original G.C. pictures, below which are details of the G.C. routes. The afternoon freight from Craigellachie now works right through to Aviemore and back the same day. D40's and 41's seen at 'The Boat' lately include 62225/30/41/2/8/62/9/71/7. SLS/195109
31/07/1951 G.N.O.S. Section - Boat of Garten The Craigellachie-Boat of Garten train is now worked completely by 62277 (61B) Gordon Highlander. This train in the last two weeks has become very interesting in that it has been composed of a G.N.S. 1st/3rd corridor of 1898 and a N.E.R. 3rd brake clerestory. The S.O. 9.18 p.m. (picture house train) has also contained unusual coaches. A G.N.R. 3rd corridor and a G.C. 1st/3rd brake, the compartments of which contain original G.C. pictures, below which are details of the G.C. routes. The afternoon freight from Craigellachie now works right through to Aviemore and back the same day. D40's and 41's seen at 'The Boat' lately include 62225/30/41/2/8/62/9/71/7. SLS/195109
17/05/1958 G.N.S.R. 49 G.N.S.R. 49 Gordon Highlander is at Inverurie repainted in G.N.S. livery. SLS/195808

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1920 To Service To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 49, name: GORDON HIGHLANDER
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22563
   
12/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6849    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2277    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT)    
13/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62277    
14/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
23/06/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 62277    
07/1958 Renumbered Renumbered to 49    

prev prev